KS HB2599 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Saturday, April 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing distinctive license plates for special Olympics Kansas, choose life, the city of Wichita, the Korean war, operation desert storm, operation Iraqi freedom and operation enduring freedom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing distinctive license plates for special Olympics Kansas, choose life, the city of Wichita, the Korean war, operation desert storm, operation Iraqi freedom and operation enduring freedom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Saturday, April 21, 2018
2018-04-26HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018
2018-04-06HouseHouse Reengrossed on Friday, April 6, 2018
2018-04-06HouseHouse Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2018-03-29SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2018-03-28HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Francis and Representative Lusker as conferees
2018-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2018-03-08SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
2018-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-22SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
2018-02-22HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was adopted
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2018-02-14HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
2018-02-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback