KS HB2599 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healing arts; concerning anatomic pathology billing.
Title
Healing arts; concerning anatomic pathology billing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-03-02 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2016-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-03 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2599/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2599_00_0000.pdf |