KS HB2588 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring encryption of student data.
Title
Requiring encryption of student data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2016-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-02 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2588/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2588_00_0000.pdf |