KS HB2571 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensure renewal of community mental health centers.
Title
Licensure renewal of community mental health centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 5 (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 5 (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Senator Kelly raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator LaTurner |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator O'Donnell |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 1:30 AM Room 118-N |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-03-10 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 5 |
2016-03-10 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 09 , 2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhoades was adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhoades |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2016-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S-CANCELLED |
2016-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-01-28 | House | House Introduced |