KS HB2569 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Title
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 March 2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 13, 2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-29 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 29, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-21 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-21 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | Introduced |