KS HB2563 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the minimum age to purchase or possess cigarettes and tobacco products from 18 to 21; prohibiting cigarette vending machines and flavored vaping products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the minimum age to purchase or possess cigarettes and tobacco products from 18 to 21; prohibiting cigarette vending machines and flavored vaping products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2020-02-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-02-04HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback