KS HB2561 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing legislative assistants and committee assistants to accept one gift of not to exceed $100 in value each legislative session from legislators.
Title
Authorizing legislative assistants and committee assistants to accept one gift of not to exceed $100 in value each legislative session from legislators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2020-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2020-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2020-02-04 | House | House Introduced |