KS HB2548 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing additional reporting requirements for informational technology projects and state agencies and requiring additional information technology security training and status reports.
Title
Implementing additional reporting requirements for informational technology projects and state agencies and requiring additional information technology security training and status reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 3 (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-09 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 3 |
2022-03-09 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 3, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 2, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2022-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-25 | House | House Introduced |