KS HB2539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections: qualifications for certain state offices; advanced ballot signature exceptions for certain disabled voters, associated affidavit requirements and perjury liability; audits of election results.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: qualifications for certain state offices; advanced ballot signature exceptions for certain disabled voters, associated affidavit requirements and perjury liability; audits of election results.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 70 Nay: 52 (Y: 70 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 4 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 9 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 19 Nay: 20 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 94 Nay: 28 (Y: 94 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected - Yea: 34 Nay: 82 (Y: 34 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
2018-05-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018
2018-05-03HouseHouse Reengrossed on Wednesday, May 2, 2018
2018-05-02HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 70 Nay: 52
2018-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 4
2018-05-01SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-27HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Esau, Representative Carpenter and Representative Miller appointed as second conferees
2018-04-27HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-26SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
2018-04-26SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-03SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
2018-04-02HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Esau , Representative Carpenter and Representative Miller as conferees
2018-03-29SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 9
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 20
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hardy was rejected
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hardy
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2018-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
2018-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2018-02-21SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-21HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 20, 2018
2018-02-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 94 Nay: 28
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lusker was adopted
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lusker
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected Yea: 34 Nay: 82
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Williams was rejected
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Williams
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter was adopted
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee Report without recommendation by Committee on Elections
2018-01-31HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N
2018-01-24HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2018-01-24HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2539/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2539_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2539_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2539_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2539_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180220115551_209076/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180221103727_179489/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180328154108_098363/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180329112541_128968/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180501150520_498239/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180502121544_058654/

Bill Comments

feedback