KS HB2534 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recreation commission; conversion of existing recreation systems.
Title
Recreation commission; conversion of existing recreation systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2014-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 04, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2014-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2534/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2534_00_0000.pdf |