KS HB2533 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the uniform family law arbitration act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the uniform family law arbitration act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-01-30HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-30HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback