KS HB2529 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a presumption of child's equal time with parents during court determinations of legal custody, residency or parenting time.
Title
Creating a presumption of child's equal time with parents during court determinations of legal custody, residency or parenting time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2529/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2529_00_0000.pdf |