KS HB2485 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning the felony loss thresholds for certain property crimes.
Title
Aligning the felony loss thresholds for certain property crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2485/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2485_00_0000.pdf |