KS HB2485 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pack St Clair highway.
Title
Pack St Clair highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2485/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2485_00_0000.pdf |