KS HB2482 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restrictions of state contracts with businesses engaged in anti-Israel boycotts.
Title
Concerning restrictions of state contracts with businesses engaged in anti-Israel boycotts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 88 Nay: 32 (Y: 88 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 32 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 32 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Engrossed on Saturday, April 7, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 88 Nay: 32 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Senator Estes, Senator Olson, and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Lynn, Senator Suellentrop, and Senator Holland on the Conference Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Barker, Representative Highland, and Representative Ruiz are appointed to replace Representative Mason, Representative Corbet, and Representative Whipple on the Conference Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Suellentrop and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2018-03-09 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Mason , Representative Corbet and Representative Whipple as conferees |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 32 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-01-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 75 Nay: 47 |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-01-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2018-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |