KS HB2482 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning restrictions of state contracts with businesses engaged in anti-Israel boycotts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning restrictions of state contracts with businesses engaged in anti-Israel boycotts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 88 Nay: 32 (Y: 88 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 32 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
2018-04-26HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018
2018-04-07HouseHouse Engrossed on Saturday, April 7, 2018
2018-04-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 88 Nay: 32
2018-04-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-06SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-02SenateSenate Senator Estes, Senator Olson, and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Lynn, Senator Suellentrop, and Senator Holland on the Conference Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Representative Barker, Representative Highland, and Representative Ruiz are appointed to replace Representative Mason, Representative Corbet, and Representative Whipple on the Conference Committee
2018-03-12SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Suellentrop and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2018-03-09HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Mason , Representative Corbet and Representative Whipple as conferees
2018-02-21SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 32
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
2018-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S
2018-01-30SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2018-01-29SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-01-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 75 Nay: 47
2018-01-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-01-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2018-01-23HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 112-N
2018-01-17HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2018-01-17HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback