KS HB2477 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Mar 5 @ 8:30 am in Room 144-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum reimbursement from the Kansas agricultural remediation fund from $200,000 to $300,000 for an eligible person and from $400,000 to $600,000 when both a buyer and a seller or a lessee and a lessor are responsible for remediation and increasing the amount available to the Kansas agricultural remediation board for administrative overhead expenses from $150,000 to $175,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the maximum reimbursement from the Kansas agricultural remediation fund from $200,000 to $300,000 for an eligible person and from $400,000 to $600,000 when both a buyer and a seller or a lessee and a lessor are responsible for remediation and increasing the amount available to the Kansas agricultural remediation board for administrative overhead expenses from $150,000 to $175,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 110 Nay: 1 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-05SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
2024-02-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-02-14SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2024-02-14HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 110 Nay: 1
2024-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2024-02-05HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2024-01-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-01-08HouseHouse Introduced
2024-01-08HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, November 28, 2023

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback