KS HB2472 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to organ donation, amending the uniform anatomical gift act.
Title
Relating to organ donation, amending the uniform anatomical gift act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2018-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-01-16 | House | House Introduced |