KS HB2452 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing certain KP&F tier II spousal and children's benefits for death resulting from a service-connected disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing certain KP&F tier II spousal and children's benefits for death resulting from a service-connected disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-03-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-03-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-02-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-11HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2020-01-29HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
2020-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2020-01-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback