KS HB2438 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the legislative post auditor to conduct an audit of the 911 coordinating council.
Title
Requiring the legislative post auditor to conduct an audit of the 911 coordinating council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 78 (Y: 43 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 78 (Y: 43 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2018-05-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Highland , Representative Humphries and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Estes was adopted |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Estes |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S - CANCELLED |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected Yea: 43 Nay: 78 |
2018-02-07 | House | House Representative Highland raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Parker |
2018-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-01-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 17, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-01-08 | House | House Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 21, 2017 |