KS HB2438 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 18 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 18 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire districts; city territory adjoining a fire district to be added.
Title
Fire districts; city territory adjoining a fire district to be added.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Merrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 18 , 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 15, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-02-05 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-01-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2016-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, November 30, 2015 |