KS HB2421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting a sales tax exemption for sales of currency, certain coins or bullion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting a sales tax exemption for sales of currency, certain coins or bullion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2018-03-19HouseHouse Motion to Rise and Report adopted. Bill remains on General Orders.
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was withdrawn
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Representative Ward requested the motion to amend by Representative Whitmer be divided. The amendment was ruled divisible and divided into 6 parts.
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2018-01-29HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 29, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2017-05-02HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2017-05-02HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback