KS HB2421 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas firearms freedom act; violations, criminal penalty
Title
Kansas firearms freedom act; violations, criminal penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Calendar | |
2012-02-01 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced | |
2012-01-09 | Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, December 30, 2011 |