KS HB2409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting state contracts with companies that are engaged in an anti-Israeli boycott.
Title
Prohibiting state contracts with companies that are engaged in an anti-Israeli boycott.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 99 Nay: 13 (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 9 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 13 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 9 (Y: 116 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 9 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 13 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 9 (Y: 116 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 16, 2017 |
2017-06-09 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 09, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, June 7, 2017 |
2017-06-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 99 Nay: 13 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Senator Hilderbrand is appointed to replace Senator Olson on the Conference Committee |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Weber and Representative Burroughs as conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 9 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was adopted Yea: 25 Nay: 13 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hawk |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, May 04, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S - Note room and time change |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-04-05 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 116 Nay: 9 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-23 | House | House Hearing and possible action: Thursday, March 23, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2017-03-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-22 | House | House Introduced |