KS HB2407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Duties of the attorney general and the secretary of administration concerning certain real estate transfers and authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase certain real property in Sherman county. .
Title
Duties of the attorney general and the secretary of administration concerning certain real estate transfers and authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase certain real property in Sherman county. .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-10 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 93 Nay: 20 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 17 (Y: 108 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 17 (Y: 108 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, June 15, 2017 |
2017-06-10 | House | House Reengrossed on Saturday, June 10, 2017 |
2017-06-10 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 93 Nay: 20 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2017-06-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Weber and Representative Burroughs appointed as second conferees |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Weber and Representative Burroughs as conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 2 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was adopted |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Thursday, May 04, 2017, 01:00 PM Room 548-S |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-04-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 108 Nay: 17 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 3, 2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-04-03 | House | House Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-23 | House | House Hearing and possible action: Thursday, March 23, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2017-03-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-22 | House | House Introduced |