KS HB2394 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of the research and development tax credit, expanding eligibility beyond corporate taxpayers and permitting transfer of the credit.
Title
Increasing the amount of the research and development tax credit, expanding eligibility beyond corporate taxpayers and permitting transfer of the credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2022-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-17 | House | House Introduced |