KS HB2390 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 19 Nay: 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 19 Nay: 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for HB 2390 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Requiring the secretary of health and environment to study drug overdose death cases and providing for the confidentiality of acquired and related records, restricting the authority of the secretary of health and environment and local health officers to prevent the introduction and spread of infectious or contagious diseases and repealing the authority of the secretary to quarantine individuals and impose associated penalties.
Title
House Substitute for HB 2390 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Requiring the secretary of health and environment to study drug overdose death cases and providing for the confidentiality of acquired and related records, restricting the authority of the secretary of health and environment and local health officers to prevent the introduction and spread of infectious or contagious diseases and repealing the authority of the secretary to quarantine individuals and impose associated penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 19 Nay: 18 (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 23 Nay: 16 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 23 Nay: 16 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 19 Nay: 18 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries and Representative Hoye appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-06 | House | House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee, and Representative Ruiz, S. on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2023-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. as conferees |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 24 Nay: 16 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed Yea: 21 Nay: 13 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Eplee was adopted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Eplee |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2023-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-02-09 | House | House Introduced |