KS HB2386 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the payment and reimbursement of dental services by a dental benefit plan.
Title
Establishing requirements for the payment and reimbursement of dental services by a dental benefit plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Reengrossed on Thursday, March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 120 Nay: 3 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2022-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 8, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |