KS HB2380 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Pending: House Corrections and Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Pending: House Corrections and Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a criminal conviction for civil asset forfeiture, remitting proceeds from civil asset forfeiture to the state general fund, increasing the burden of proof required to forfeit property, making certain property ineligible for forfeiture, providing persons involved in forfeiture proceedings representation by counsel and the ability to demand a jury trial and allowing a person to request a hearing on whether forfeiture is excessive.
Title
Requiring a criminal conviction for civil asset forfeiture, remitting proceeds from civil asset forfeiture to the state general fund, increasing the burden of proof required to forfeit property, making certain property ineligible for forfeiture, providing persons involved in forfeiture proceedings representation by counsel and the ability to demand a jury trial and allowing a person to request a hearing on whether forfeiture is excessive.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | House | House Introduced |