KS HB2373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the transportation planning program.
Title
Creating the transportation planning program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-03-07 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | House Introduced |