KS HB2365 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing immunity from criminal prosecution for possession of controlled substances or drug paraphernalia if seeking assistance related to substance use.
Title
Providing immunity from criminal prosecution for possession of controlled substances or drug paraphernalia if seeking assistance related to substance use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | House Introduced |