KS HB2328 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employer contributions for KPERS school participating employers.
Title
Employer contributions for KPERS school participating employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing: Wednesday, March 02, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 142-S | |
2011-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Committee on Pensions and Benefits; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |