KS HB2313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas lottery; permit lottery ticket vending machines; repealing lottery sunset.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas lottery; permit lottery ticket vending machines; repealing lottery sunset.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 19 (Y: 98 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 4 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 16 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was rejected - Yea: 17 Nay: 22 (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 100 Nay: 25 (Y: 100 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseHouse No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
2017-06-26HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Thursday, June 15, 2017
2017-06-09HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 09, 2017
2017-06-07HouseHouse Reengrossed on Tuesday, June 6, 2017
2017-06-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 19
2017-06-06SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 4
2017-06-06SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2017-06-02HouseHouse Representative Highland, Representative Williams, and Representative Ruiz are appointed to replace Representative Barker, Representative Highland, and Representative Ruiz on the Conference Committee
2017-06-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
2017-05-31HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees
2017-05-31HouseHouse Challenge under Joint Rule 3(f) regarding subject matters contained in a conference committee report; report ruled in order and ruling was sustained.
2017-05-31HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-18SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 16
2017-05-18SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2017-05-18SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-11SenateSenate Senator Olson is appointed to replace Senator Estes on the Conference Committee
2017-05-11SenateSenate Senator Estes is appointed to replace Senator LaTurner on the Conference Committee
2017-04-04SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator LaTurner, Senator Estes and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
2017-04-03HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees
2017-03-30SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was rejected Yea: 17 Nay: 22
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was withdrawn
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-24SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-23SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-03-23HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 100 Nay: 25
2017-03-23HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, March 22, 2017
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative DeGraaf
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Weber
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-07HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2017-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2313/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2313_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2313_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2313_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2313_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2313_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170323112238_627034/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170330121537_062197/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170330164840_957203/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170518120549_175374/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170606151950_598808/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170606172507_269195/

Bill Comments

feedback