KS HB2313 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2313 by Committee on Judiciary -- Creating an out of state juvenile offender registration requirement.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2313 by Committee on Judiciary -- Creating an out of state juvenile offender registration requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012 | |
2012-05-14 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 14, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Reengrossed on Thursday, 10 May 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-03 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-03 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-28 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-26 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-19 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012 | |
2012-02-23 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-10 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |