KS HB2306 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending provisions concerning annual examinations, transitional release and conditional release of sexually violent predators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending provisions concerning annual examinations, transitional release and conditional release of sexually violent predators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
2017-03-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 27, 2017
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 06, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELLED
2017-02-16HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-14HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2017-02-14HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback