KS HB2301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring accredited high schools to provide a course of instruction in personal financial literacy.
Title
Requiring accredited high schools to provide a course of instruction in personal financial literacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |