KS HB2285 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the veto is sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the veto is sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of health and environment to study drug overdose death cases and providing for the confidentiality of related records, restricting the authority of the secretary of health and environment and local health officers to control the spread of infectious or contagious diseases, repealing the authority of the secretary to quarantine individuals and impose penalties for violations thereof and prohibiting the secretary of health and environment from requiring COVID-19 vaccination for children attending a child care facility or school.
Title
Requiring the secretary of health and environment to study drug overdose death cases and providing for the confidentiality of related records, restricting the authority of the secretary of health and environment and local health officers to control the spread of infectious or contagious diseases, repealing the authority of the secretary to quarantine individuals and impose penalties for violations thereof and prohibiting the secretary of health and environment from requiring COVID-19 vaccination for children attending a child care facility or school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 56 (Y: 63 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | House The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the veto is sustained. |
2023-04-28 | House | House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2023-04-28 | House | House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, May 12, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 56 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries and Representative Hoye appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-27 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson, and Senator Pettey are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as conferees |
2023-03-27 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor as conferees |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2023-02-02 | House | House Introduced |