KS HB2277 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of possession in the Kansas criminal code.
Title
Clarifying the definition of possession in the Kansas criminal code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 8 (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-26 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 8 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |