KS HB2275 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department of corrections to develop guidance to be used by parole officers when responding to violations of parole and postrelease supervision and that incentivize compliant behavior.
Title
Requiring the department of corrections to develop guidance to be used by parole officers when responding to violations of parole and postrelease supervision and that incentivize compliant behavior.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |