KS HB2248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing all-terrain vehicles to cross federal or state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing all-terrain vehicles to cross federal or state highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Braun
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback