KS HB2241 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2241 by Committee on Ways and Means - Authorizing transfer of moneys to local ad valorem tax reduction fund; distribution to political subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2241 by Committee on Ways and Means - Authorizing transfer of moneys to local ad valorem tax reduction fund; distribution to political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 24 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was rejected - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-01 Died in Committee
2012-03-26 Ruled materially changed and referred to Committee on Appropriations
2012-03-21 Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was adopted
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Masterson
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 24
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wagle
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was rejected
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 21
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King
2012-03-20 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2012-03-19 Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2011-05-12 Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-05-04 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-03-28 Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-03-23 Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-03-18 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-02-25 Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-05-12 Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
2011-02-24 Received and Introduced
2011-02-24 Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 1
2011-02-23 Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2011-02-23 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was rejected
2011-02-23 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
2011-02-23 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2011-02-21 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2011-02-15 Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 784 DSOB
2011-02-10 Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2011-02-09 Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2241/
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/m/pdf/hb2241_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2241_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2241_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2241_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2241_04_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2241_05_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110224103524_039066/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110224103524_039066/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20120320181640_168876/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20120320185653_465214/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20120321094021_691104/

Bill Comments

feedback