KS HB2225 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2225 by Senate Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Healing arts; relating to licenses, medical retainer agreements and access to health records.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2225 by Senate Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Healing arts; relating to licenses, medical retainer agreements and access to health records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 3 (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 07 , 2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 05, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 3 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Senator Francisco replaces Senator Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator O'Donnell and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2015-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Concannon and Representative Ward as conferees |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 26 , 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 17, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2015-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-04 | House | House Introduced |