KS HB2224 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring candidates for state and federal offices to provide proof of citizenship.
Title
Requiring candidates for state and federal offices to provide proof of citizenship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 | |
2012-02-17 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 546-S | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Elections | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |