KS HB2223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting economic development program evaluation and information disclosure regimes and expanding economic development incentive financing to address housing shortages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting economic development program evaluation and information disclosure regimes and expanding economic development incentive financing to address housing shortages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, May 13, 2019
2019-05-03HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 3, 2019
2019-05-02HouseHouse Reengrossed on Thursday, May 2, 2019
2019-05-02HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-04-03HouseHouse Representative Tarwater, Representative Corbet, and Representative Frownfelter are appointed to replace Representative Barker, Representative Awerkamp, and Representative Stogsdill on the Conference Committee
2019-04-03SenateSenate Senator Lynn, Senator Pilcher-Cook, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Estes, Senator Olson, and Senator Faust-Goudeau on the Conference Committee
2019-04-03HouseHouse Representative Stogsdill is appointed to replace Representative Ruiz, L. on the Conference Committee
2019-04-02SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
2019-04-02HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Awerkamp and Representative Ruiz, L. as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2019-03-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2019-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-11HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback