KS HB2216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing state employee student loan repayment assistance act.
Title
Establishing state employee student loan repayment assistance act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Alcala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2019-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2019-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2216/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2216_00_0000.pdf |