KS HB2203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 32 (Y: 92 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
2019-05-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Reengrossed on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-05-04SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-04SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-05-01HouseHouse Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Wolfe Moore are appointed to replace Representative Kelly, Representative Orr, and Representative Finney on the Conference Committee
2019-05-01SenateSenate Senator McGinn and Senator Hawk are appointed to replace Senator Olson and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Billinger and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Orr and Representative Finney as conferees
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2019-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 92 Nay: 32
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback