KS HB2193 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public facilities; accessibility standards for disabled persons.
Title
Public facilities; accessibility standards for disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 15, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2013-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-01-31 | House | House Introduced |