KS HB2185 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting short form notification service and alternative methods of service under the protection from abuse act and the protection from stalking, sexual assault or human trafficking act and clarifying precedence of child-related orders issued under the protection from abuse act.
Title
Permitting short form notification service and alternative methods of service under the protection from abuse act and the protection from stalking, sexual assault or human trafficking act and clarifying precedence of child-related orders issued under the protection from abuse act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-26 | House | House Introduced |