KS HB2176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing exceptions to the parental notification requirement when a sexual assault evidence collection examination of a minor has taken place.
Title
Providing exceptions to the parental notification requirement when a sexual assault evidence collection examination of a minor has taken place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 108 Nay: 17 (Y: 108 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 108 Nay: 17 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | House Introduced |