KS HB2167 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB2167 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs – Concerning fireworks; regulations thereof.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB2167 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs – Concerning fireworks; regulations thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 100 Nay: 23 (Y: 100 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 100 Nay: 23 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 07, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S - CANCELLED |
2013-01-31 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2013-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-01-30 | House | House Introduced |